## Introduction

Multiplication of 2, 3, and 4 digits by 2 digits...such a long title. But long story short, it's just simple multiplication. The only thing you need to be careful about is the number of digits in the numbers. Besides that, this is just a piece of cake!

## Multiply 2 digits by 2 digits...

Let's say that you have a problem such as 24x46. This is a 2 digit by 2 digit problem. In order to do this, just multiply:

24x46=1104.

So, the product of 24x46=1104.

Now wasn't that a piece of cake!

## Multiply 3 digits by 2 digits...

Let' say that you have a problem such as 792x67. This is a 3 digit by 2 digit problem. I know the numbers are larger but as long as you know the method, it should be easy!

792x67=53,064

## Multiply 4 digits by 2 digits...

Just like we multiplied a 2 digit and 3 digit number by a 2 digit number, this is similar.

6,829x56=382,424

I hope you guys understood this topic. Stay around for further lessons and Good Luck!

*Sheet 1 Multiplying 2, 3, and 4 Digit Numbers by 2 Digit Numbers*

## No comments:

## Post a Comment